Video: AQA GCSE Mathematics Foundation Tier Pack 2 • Paper 1 • Question 9

Calculate 43 × 29.

03:37

Video Transcript

Calculate 43 multiplied by 29.

There are lots of ways of working out this calculation. We will look at the grid method and long multiplication. For the grid method, we split 43 into 40 and three. We split 29 into 20 and nine. We then need to work out four different multiplication calculations: 40 multiplied by 20, 40 multiplied by nine, three multiplied by 20, and three multiplied by nine.

Four multiplied by two is equal to eight. This means that 40 multiplied by 20 is equal to 800. We add the two zeros. Four multiplied by nine is equal to 36. Therefore, 40 multiplied by nine is equal to 360. We add the zero. Three multiplied by two is equal to six. Adding the zero gives us 60. Therefore, three multiplied by 20 is 60. Finally, three multiplied by nine is equal to 27.

We now need to add our four answers: 800, 360, 60, and 27. Adding the numbers in the units column gives us seven. Adding the numbers in the tens column, six, six, and two, gives us 14. We put a four in the answer and carry the one. Eight plus three is equal to 11. Adding the one that we carried gives us 12. Therefore, our answer is 1247. 43 multiplied by 29 is equal to 1247.

We can check this answer using long multiplication. Our first step here is multiplying nine by three. This gives us 27. We then multiply nine by four. Nine multiplied by four is equal to 36. Adding the two that we carried gives us 38. Our next step is to multiply the three and the four by two. But the two is in the tens column. So in effect, we’re multiplying by 20. In order to do this, we put a zero in the units column first. Two multiplied by three is equal to six. And finally, two multiplied by four is equal to eight. This tells us that 43 multiplied by nine is 387 and 43 multiplied by 20 is 860.

We now need to add these two rows. Seven plus zero is equal to seven. Eight plus six is equal to 14. So we need to carry the one. Three plus eight is equal to 11. Adding the one that we carried gives us 12. Once again, we have proved that the answer to 43 multiplied by 29 is 1247. There are lots of other ways you could have worked out this calculation. And as long as you show your method, you will get the full marks.

Nagwa uses cookies to ensure you get the best experience on our website. Learn more about our Privacy Policy.