Video: Using Partial Products to Multiply Multi-Digit Whole Numbers

Amelia and Noah are discussing how to calculate the partial products for this algorithm. 2389 × 76. Amelia says to calculate 2389 × 70 and 2389 × 6. Noah says to calculate 2389 × 7 and 2389 × 6. Who is correct?

01:32

Video Transcript

Amelia and Noah are discussing how to calculate the partial products for this algorithm: 2389 times 76. Amelia says to calculate 2389 times 70 and 2389 times six. Noah says to calculate 2389 times seven and 2389 times six. Who is correct?

Let’s break down what Amelia is saying and what Noah is saying. Amelia says 2389 times 70; 2389 times six. Noah says 2389 times seven; 2389 times six. Looking at Amelia’s, if we add 70 and six together, we get 76. And Noah’s case seven plus six equals 13.

Amelia would be calculating 2389 times 76. Noah would be calculating 2389 times 13. Amelia has correctly calculated the partial products.

Nagwa uses cookies to ensure you get the best experience on our website. Learn more about our Privacy Policy.